This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 17:44:49 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC v. WAYNE CRANE

Case Summary

On 05/18/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WAYNE CRANE. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert B Wiggins. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********68CV

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert B Wiggins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Wayne Crane

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STILLER, CRAIG SCOTT

Attorney at PRESSLER FELT & WARSHAW, LLP

WARSHAW, DAVID BARRY

Attorney at PRESSLER & PRESSLER LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID); Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/18/2019; Received: 05/18/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/18/2019; Received: 05/18/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID); Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/18/2019; Received: 05/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/18/2019; Received: 05/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less