This case was last updated from Cortland County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 20:35:13 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC v. TINA DEFOREST

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TINA DEFOREST. This case was filed in Cortland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1388

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Cortland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Tina Deforest

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EINSTEIN, STEPHEN

Attorney at STEPHEN EINSTEIN & ASSOCIATES P.C.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) 349601

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) 349601; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Tina DeForest

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Tina DeForest; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT DEFOREST, T

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT DEFOREST, T; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) 349601; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Tina DeForest; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT DEFOREST, T; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less