This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 05/13/2020 at 12:29:04 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC - v. - STACEY HESTER

Case Summary

On 09/29/2018 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STACEY HESTER. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2561

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Stacey Hester

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/29/2018; Received: 09/29/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

20 DAY LETTER

20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 10/29/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/29/2018; Received: 09/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less