Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/03/2020 at 02:31:48 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC v. MICHAEL ADKINS

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL ADKINS. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2019

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Michael Adkins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WARSHAW, DAVID BARRY

Attorney at PRESSLER & PRESSLER LLP

STILLER, CRAIG SCOTT

Attorney at PRESSLER FELT & WARSHAW, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING EFILE

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING EFILE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT MICHAEL ADKINS

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT MICHAEL ADKINS; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING EFILE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT MICHAEL ADKINS; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less