This case was last updated from Essex County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 17:48:06 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC v. LORETTA HOWE

Case Summary

On 05/18/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LORETTA HOWE. This case was filed in Essex County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0245

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING L L C

Defendant

Loretta Howe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WARSHAW, DAVID BARRY

Attorney at PRESSLER & PRESSLER LLP

STILLER, CRAIG SCOTT

Attorney at PRESSLER FELT & WARSHAW, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/18/2019; Received: 05/18/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/18/2019; Received: 05/18/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/18/2019; Received: 05/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/18/2019; Received: 05/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less