This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 22:30:32 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC v. LLOYD SCHUL

Case Summary

On 04/06/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against LLOYD SCHUL. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Lloyd Schul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STILLER, CRAIG SCOTT

Attorney at PRESSLER FELT & WARSHAW, LLP

WARSHAW, DAVID BARRY

Attorney at PRESSLER & PRESSLER LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 04/24/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 04/24/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/06/2019; Received: 04/06/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT LLOYD SCHUL

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT LLOYD SCHUL; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/06/2019; Received: 04/06/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 04/24/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/06/2019; Received: 04/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT LLOYD SCHUL; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/06/2019; Received: 04/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less