Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 03/12/2020 at 16:30:08 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC v. Laura Birli

Case Summary

On 09/10/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Laura Birli. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Laura Birli

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EINSTEIN, STEPHEN

Attorney at STEPHEN EINSTEIN & ASSOCIATES P.C.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ANSWER/LAURA BIRLI

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ANSWER/LAURA BIRLI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 10/03/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 10/03/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ANSWER/LAURA BIRLI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL REQUIRED MAILING-MAILED 10/03/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less