This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 00:29:53 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC v. KEVIN SMITH

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against KEVIN SMITH. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Kevin Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less