This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 17:31:56 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC - v. - JUANA MEJIA

Case Summary

On 06/14/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JUANA MEJIA. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1311

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Broome County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Juana Mejia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2018; Received: 04/20/2018

20 DAY LETTER

20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/16/2018; Received: 04/16/2018

20 DAY LETTER

20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/16/2018; Received: 04/16/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 04/20/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B TERMS

EXHIBIT(S) - B TERMS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2018; Received: 04/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/16/2018; Received: 04/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/16/2018; Received: 04/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 04/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B TERMS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less