This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 17:46:31 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC v. JOSEPH BARKALOW

Case Summary

On 05/18/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSEPH BARKALOW. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert B Wiggins. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********69CV

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert B Wiggins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendants

Joseph Ii Barkalow A/K/A JOSEPH C BARKALOW II

Joseph c Ii Barkalow

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WARSHAW, DAVID BARRY

Attorney at PRESSLER & PRESSLER LLP

STILLER, CRAIG SCOTT

Attorney at PRESSLER FELT & WARSHAW, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/18/2019; Received: 05/18/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/18/2019; Received: 05/18/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/18/2019; Received: 05/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 05/18/2019; Received: 05/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less