This case was last updated from Dutchess County Courts on 04/15/2020 at 16:04:41 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC - v. - JOSE HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSE HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Dutchess County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2747

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dutchess, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Jose Hernandez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

 

Court Documents

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING MAILED 3/22/2018

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING MAILED 3/22/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/30/2018; Received: 05/30/2018

JUDGMENT As entered by County Clerk

JUDGMENT As entered by County Clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING MAILED 3/22/18

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING MAILED 3/22/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/23/2018; Received: 03/23/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B TERMS

EXHIBIT(S) - B TERMS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 12/20/2017; Received: 12/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 12/20/2017; Received: 12/20/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING MAILED 3/22/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/30/2018; Received: 05/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT As entered by County Clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING MAILED 3/22/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/23/2018; Received: 03/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B TERMS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 12/20/2017; Received: 12/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 12/20/2017; Received: 12/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less