Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/02/2020 at 19:34:04 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC v. JOAN RICE

Case Summary

On 07/13/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOAN RICE. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2019

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Joan Rice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WARSHAW, DAVID BARRY

Attorney at PRESSLER & PRESSLER LLP

STILLER, CRAIG SCOTT

Attorney at PRESSLER FELT & WARSHAW, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF NON-MILITARY

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF NON-MILITARY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/13/2019; Received: 07/13/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT JOAN RICE

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT JOAN RICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/13/2019; Received: 07/13/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF NON-MILITARY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/13/2019; Received: 07/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT JOAN RICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 07/13/2019; Received: 07/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less