Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/03/2020 at 13:54:55 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC v. JESSICA WALKER

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JESSICA WALKER. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2019

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Jessica Walker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less