Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 16:50:35 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC v. JEFFREY DICKERSON

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEFFREY DICKERSON. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Jeffrey Dickerson A/K/A JEFFREY T DICKERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WARSHAW, DAVID BARRY

Attorney at PRESSLER & PRESSLER LLP

STILLER, CRAIG SCOTT

Attorney at PRESSLER FELT & WARSHAW, LLP

Defendant Attorney

LAZROE, MATTHEW ALLEN

Attorney at Matthew A Lazroe, Esq.

 

Court Documents

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Lazroe, M.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Lazroe, M.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Lazroe, M.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF NON-MILITARY

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF NON-MILITARY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT JEFFREY DICKERSON A/K/A JEFFREY T DICKERSON

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT JEFFREY DICKERSON A/K/A JEFFREY T DICKERSON; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Lazroe, M.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Lazroe, M.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Lazroe, M.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF NON-MILITARY; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stiller, C.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT JEFFREY DICKERSON A/K/A JEFFREY T DICKERSON; Filed By: Warshaw, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 11/05/2019; Received: 11/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less