Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 18:55:36 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC v. JAVASHA WHITE

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAVASHA WHITE. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Javasha White

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 23, 2020

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 23, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001)

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

MILITARY SEARCH RESULT

EXHIBIT(S)

PROCESS SERVER BILL

EXHIBIT(S)

NOTICE OF DEFAULT

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 23, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) MILITARY SEARCH RESULT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) PROCESS SERVER BILL; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) NOTICE OF DEFAULT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less