This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 13:08:30 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC - v. - HONORE COLLIGAN

Case Summary

On 05/19/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against HONORE COLLIGAN. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Honore Colligan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 27, 2018

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 27, 2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS

EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2018; Received: 02/14/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 27, 2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2018; Received: 02/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less