This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 22:34:46 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC v. Chrisitna Olson

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Chrisitna Olson. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1246

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Chrisitna Olson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EINSTEIN, STEPHEN

Attorney at STEPHEN EINSTEIN & ASSOCIATES P.C.

Defendant Attorney

OLSON, AVERY SCOTT

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Olson, A.; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Olson, A.; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 10/28/2019; Received: 10/28/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Olson, A.; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Olson, A.; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 10/28/2019; Received: 10/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less