This case was last updated from Madison County New York Courts on 10/23/2021 at 10:22:01 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC v. TIMOTHY M ADAMS

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TIMOTHY M ADAMS. This case was filed in Madison County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1828

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Madison, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

Timothy M Adams

Oneida, NY 13421-2461

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BANN, STEVEN P

Defendant Attorney

RUGGIERO, DANIEL G

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT TIMOTHY M ADAMS

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT TIMOTHY M ADAMS; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 10/05/2021; Received: 10/05/2021

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Ruggiero, D. - filed by Daniel Goldsmith Ruggiero; Filed: 10/07/2021; Received: 10/07/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ruggiero, D. - filed by Daniel Goldsmith Ruggiero; Filed: 10/07/2021; Received: 10/07/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ruggiero, D. - filed by Daniel Goldsmith Ruggiero; Filed: 10/07/2021; Received: 10/07/2021

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/13/2021; Received: 10/13/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/13/2021; Received: 10/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ruggiero, D. - filed by Daniel Goldsmith Ruggiero; Filed: 10/07/2021; Received: 10/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ruggiero, D. - filed by Daniel Goldsmith Ruggiero; Filed: 10/07/2021; Received: 10/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Ruggiero, D. - filed by Daniel Goldsmith Ruggiero; Filed: 10/07/2021; Received: 10/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 10/05/2021; Received: 10/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT TIMOTHY M ADAMS; Filed By: Bann, S. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less