This case was last updated from Essex County New York Courts on 11/22/2021 at 14:14:48 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. v. REMI P M BORDEN et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against REMI P M BORDEN. This case was filed in Essex County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0164

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendants

Remi P m Borden

R p Borden AKA

Remi P m Borden AKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POULIN, ANTHONY SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

VanZyverden, William

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Poulin, A. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/06/2021; Received: 04/06/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Poulin, A. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/06/2021; Received: 04/06/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Poulin, A. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/05/2021; Received: 05/05/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/11/2021; Received: 05/11/2021

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 06/24/2021; Received: 06/24/2021

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 06/24/2021; Received: 06/24/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 06/24/2021; Received: 06/24/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 06/24/2021; Received: 06/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 06/24/2021; Received: 06/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Vanzyverden, W.; Filed: 06/24/2021; Received: 06/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/11/2021; Received: 05/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Poulin, A. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/05/2021; Received: 05/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Poulin, A. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/06/2021; Received: 04/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Poulin, A. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/06/2021; Received: 04/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VanZyverden, William