This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 04/29/2020 at 14:06:33 (UTC).

MidFirst Bank - v. - Janet Lyndaker et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2018 MidFirst Bank filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Janet Lyndaker. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Nassau, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2018

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MidFirst Bank

Defendants

Internal Revenue service United states of america

New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

ESTATE OF BETTY I WHITNEY Complaint

Betty I Whitney

Janet Lyndaker Individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Betty I. Whitney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FALASCO, TODD C

FEMMINELLA, NICOLE P

Bolduc, Kristin Marie

TREMAROLI, ROBERT STEVEN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #3) Confirming Referee's Report of Sale

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #3) Confirming Referee's Report of Sale; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) PROPOSED ORDER

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) PROPOSED ORDER; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Attorney Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F

EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JANET LYNDAKER, INDIVIDUALLY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JANET LYNDAKER, INDIVIDUALLY; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA O/B/O INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA O/B/O INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/22/2018; Received: 05/22/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/22/2018; Received: 05/22/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint Supporting Documents Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint Supporting Documents Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Certificate of Merit Supporting Docs Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Certificate of Merit Supporting Docs Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #3) Confirming Referee's Report of Sale; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) PROPOSED ORDER; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B; Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A2 Exhibit A2 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Falasco, T.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JANET LYNDAKER AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF BETTY I. WHITNEY; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JANET LYNDAKER, INDIVIDUALLY; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA O/B/O INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/22/2018; Received: 05/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Bolduc, K. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/22/2018; Received: 05/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint Supporting Documents Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Certificate of Merit Supporting Docs Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bolduc, K.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less