This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 09/23/2022 at 01:10:21 (UTC).

MIDFIRST BANK v. CHAD LIVERMORE et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 MIDFIRST BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CHAD LIVERMORE. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Gerald A Keene. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2784

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Gerald A Keene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDFIRST BANK

Defendants

Chad Livermore

AND JOHN DOE AND MARY DOE, (SAID NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS, IT BEING THE INTENTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROGERS, HEATHER C

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 02/10/2022; Received: 02/10/2022

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Stephen Ferri, Esq.

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Stephen Ferri, Esq.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/09/2022; Received: 02/09/2022

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/26/2022; Received: 01/26/2022

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/26/2022; Received: 01/26/2022

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/26/2022; Received: 01/26/2022

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/26/2022; Received: 01/26/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (2)

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/11/2022; Received: 01/11/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/11/2022; Received: 01/11/2022

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/06/2022; Received: 01/06/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HEATHER MARY DOE 1 TENANT MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HEATHER MARY DOE 1 TENANT MAILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/17/2021; Received: 12/17/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/17/2021; Received: 12/17/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HEATHER MARY DOE 1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HEATHER MARY DOE 1; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/17/2021; Received: 12/17/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHAD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHAD; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/17/2021; Received: 12/17/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 11/24/2021; Received: 11/24/2021

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 11/24/2021; Received: 11/24/2021

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 11/24/2021; Received: 11/24/2021

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 11/24/2021; Received: 11/24/2021

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 11/24/2021; Received: 11/24/2021

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 02/10/2022; Received: 02/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Stephen Ferri, Esq.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/09/2022; Received: 02/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/26/2022; Received: 01/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/26/2022; Received: 01/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/26/2022; Received: 01/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/26/2022; Received: 01/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/11/2022; Received: 01/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/11/2022; Received: 01/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/06/2022; Received: 01/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/06/2022; Received: 01/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/17/2021; Received: 12/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HEATHER MARY DOE 1 TENANT MAILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/17/2021; Received: 12/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/17/2021; Received: 12/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HEATHER MARY DOE 1; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/17/2021; Received: 12/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHAD; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 12/17/2021; Received: 12/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 11/24/2021; Received: 11/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 11/24/2021; Received: 11/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 11/24/2021; Received: 11/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 11/24/2021; Received: 11/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL. Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 11/24/2021; Received: 11/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROGERS, HEATHER C