This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 09:45:27 (UTC).

MIDFIRST BANK v. BRADLEY CLARK et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 MIDFIRST BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BRADLEY CLARK. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judges overseeing this case are _ Cp Part, Cp Part and Charles D Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

Judge Details

Judges

_ Cp Part, Cp Part

Charles D Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDFIRST BANK

Defendants

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Lowman Clark JR.

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

and JOHN DOE and MARY DOE, (said names being fictitious, it being the intention of plaintiff to designate any and all occupants, tenants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premises being foreclosed he

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

Bradley Clark

Kelvin D. Clark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROGERS, HEATHER C

Attorney at DAVIDSON, FINK, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

GURA, JOHN E.

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE- S.D.N.Y.

KLEINBAUM, CLIFFORD GEORGE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CLIFFORD G. KLEINBAUM

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #2)

ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

NOTICE OF REJECTION REJECTION OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF REJECTION REJECTION OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos midland

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos midland; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom secretary of housing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom secretary of housing; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom secretary of housing and

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom secretary of housing and; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos klevin d. clark

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos klevin d. clark; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION REJECTION OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos secretary of housing; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos midland; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom secretary of housing; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom secretary of housing and; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos klevin d. clark; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less