This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 00:06:06 (UTC).

MID-HUDSON VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. SANDRA CROUNSE

Case Summary

On 04/23/2019 MID-HUDSON VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SANDRA CROUNSE. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1207

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Broome County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MID-HUDSON VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Sandra Crounse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARTLAND, PATRICK THOMAS

Attorney at Corbally, Gartland and Rappleyea, LLP

 

Court Documents

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1)

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) proposed Order-Judgment

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) proposed Order-Judgment; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE WITH MOTION FILED

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE WITH MOTION FILED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) note

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) note; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of service of summons and complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of service of summons and complaint; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) summons and verified complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) summons and verified complaint; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #1) Certificate of signature

CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #1) Certificate of signature; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Attorney's Affidavit in Support

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Attorney's Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Plaintiff's affidavit in support

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Plaintiff's affidavit in support; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for summary judgment

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for summary judgment; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

AFFIDAVIT service

AFFIDAVIT service; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT MHVFCU Verified S&C

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT MHVFCU Verified S&C Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) proposed Order-Judgment; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE WITH MOTION FILED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) note; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of service of summons and complaint; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) summons and verified complaint; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #1) Certificate of signature; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Attorney's Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Plaintiff's affidavit in support; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for summary judgment; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT service; Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT MHVFCU Verified S&C Filed By: Gartland, P.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less