This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 03/11/2021 at 01:55:30 (UTC).

MID-HUDSON VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. ANNE SURAK

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 MID-HUDSON VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANNE SURAK. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1344

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Washington, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MID-HUDSON VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Anne Surak

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREEDMAN, PERRY D

Attorney at PERRY DEAN FREEMAN

 

Court Documents

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/09/2020; Received: 12/10/2020

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/09/2020; Received: 12/09/2020

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of facts by original creditor

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of facts by original creditor; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

AFFIRMATION affirmation of non expiration of SOL

AFFIRMATION affirmation of non expiration of SOL; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE notice of default

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE notice of default; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of facts

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of facts; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFF OF MAILING/2ND NOTICE LETTER

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFF OF MAILING/2ND NOTICE LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Freedman, P. - filed by J&E Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Freedman, P. - filed by J&E Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/09/2020; Received: 12/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/09/2020; Received: 12/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT affidavit of facts by original creditor; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION affirmation of non expiration of SOL; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE notice of default; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT affidavit of facts; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 10/02/2020; Received: 10/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFF OF MAILING/2ND NOTICE LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Freedman, P. - filed by J&E; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Freedman, P. - filed by J&E; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Freedman, P.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less