This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 07:00:51 (UTC).

Michelle Ryan Blaessig v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Michelle Ryan Blaessig filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is John J Ark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0164

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

John J Ark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle ryan Blaessig Executrix of the Estate of Lois W. Ryan, Deceased

Defendants

Foster Wheeler LLC

R.E. Hebert and Company, Inc.

Grinnell LLC

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Crane Co.

Pfaudler, Inc.

Warren Pumps LLC

William Summerhays' Sons Corporation

General Electric Company

Aurora Pump Company

Industrial Insulation Sales, Inc.

Rochester Industrial Insulation, Inc.

The William Powell Company

Armstrong International, Inc.

Frontier Insulation Contractors, Inc. f/k/a Frontier Insulation and Asbestos, Inc.

Flowserve US, Inc. solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company Edward Valves, Inc. and Edward Vogt Valve Company

IMO Industries Inc. individually and as successor in interest to IMO Delaval

ITT Corporation f/k/a ITT Industries, Inc. individually and as successor to ITT Fluid Products Corp. ITT Hoffman ITT Bell & Gossett Company and ITT Marlow

Riley Power Inc. f/k/a Babcock Borsig Power, Inc. f/k/a DB Riley, Inc. f/k/a Riley Stoker Corporation

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COMERFORD, JOHN P.

Attorney at Lipsitz & Ponterio, LLC

ESFORD, SEAN MICHAEL

Attorney at Lipsitz & Ponterio, LLC

Defendant Attorneys

TANENBAUM, MICHAEL A

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

NEMETH, MARK STEPHEN

Attorney at FELDMAN KIEFFER, LLP

NOWAK, JAMES S

Attorney at Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP

PEHUSH, TARA LYNNE

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

BROOKS, STEPHEN PHILIP

GOODEARL, DAVID JAMES

Attorney at LEADER BERKON COLAO & SILVERSTEIN LLP

COOK, KERRYANN MARIE

Attorney at The Cook Group, PLLC

BOTTICELLI, JASON ANTHONY

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA

HULL, RONALD GEORGE

Attorney at Heisman Nunes & Hull LLP

MUELLER, WILLIAM F

Attorney at CLEMENTE MUELLER, P.A.

DEAN, MEAGAN ELIZABETH

Attorney at McGivney, Kluger, Clark & Intoccia, P.C.

HERRSCHER, MARY JO

Attorney at PHILLIPS LYTLE LLP

Other Attorneys

GREENE, NORMAN E.

Attorney at BOUVIER LAW LLP

NAYLON, PATRICK BRENNAN

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP

DAVIE, STEPHEN S.

Attorney at MACKENZIE HUGHES LLP

BURGASSER, JESSICA JEAN

Attorney at Wilbraham, Lawler & Buba

SNIDER, CAROL GUCK

Attorney at BARCLAY DAMON LLP

YAVITZ, JUDITH A

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Air & Liquid/Buffalo Pumps

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Air & Liquid/Buffalo Pumps; Filed By: Burgasser, J.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

ANSWER Answer Air& Liquid /Buffalo Pumps

ANSWER Answer Air& Liquid /Buffalo Pumps; Filed By: Burgasser, J.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Naylon, P.; Filed: 05/15/2020; Received: 05/15/2020

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/11/2020; Received: 05/11/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Ltr sending Scheduling Order to Judge for Execution

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Ltr sending Scheduling Order to Judge for Execution; Filed By: Snider, C.; Filed: 05/08/2020; Received: 05/08/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Scheduling Order=2/9/21

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Scheduling Order=2/9/21; Filed By: Snider, C.; Filed: 05/08/2020; Received: 05/08/2020

ANSWER ViacomCBS - Verified Answer

ANSWER ViacomCBS - Verified Answer; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 03/22/2020; Received: 03/22/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance on behalf of Aurora Pump

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance on behalf of Aurora Pump; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance on behalf of Armstrong International

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance on behalf of Armstrong International; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

ANSWER Answer to the Complaint on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc.

ANSWER Answer to the Complaint on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc.; Filed By: Dean, M.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer and Cross-Claims of Defendant PFAUDLER, INC.

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer and Cross-Claims of Defendant PFAUDLER, INC.; Filed By: Brooks, S.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Davie, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

ANSWER Answer to Complaint

ANSWER Answer to Complaint; Filed By: Mueller, W.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) On behalf of Spirax Sarco

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) On behalf of Spirax Sarco; Filed By: Greene, N.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Comerford, J.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Comerford, J.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Comerford, J.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Air & Liquid/Buffalo Pumps; Filed By: Burgasser, J.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer Air& Liquid /Buffalo Pumps; Filed By: Burgasser, J.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Naylon, P.; Filed: 05/15/2020; Received: 05/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/11/2020; Received: 05/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Ltr sending Scheduling Order to Judge for Execution; Filed By: Snider, C.; Filed: 05/08/2020; Received: 05/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Scheduling Order=2/9/21; Filed By: Snider, C.; Filed: 05/08/2020; Received: 05/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ViacomCBS - Verified Answer; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 03/22/2020; Received: 03/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance on behalf of Aurora Pump; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance on behalf of Armstrong International; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FW - Verified Answer; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dean, M.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to the Complaint on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc.; Filed By: Dean, M.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer and Cross-Claims of Defendant PFAUDLER, INC.; Filed By: Brooks, S.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Davie, S.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Complaint; Filed By: Mueller, W.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) On behalf of Spirax Sarco; Filed By: Greene, N.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Comerford, J.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Comerford, J.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Comerford, J.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less