This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:52:25 (UTC).

Michelle Frazier - v. - Gwendolyn N. Jackson

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Michelle Frazier filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Gwendolyn N Jackson. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle Frazier

Defendant

Gwendolyn N. Jackson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAGENDZO, EITAN ZWI

Attorney at Magendzo Law, P.C.

SEITELMAN, MARK E

Attorney at MARK E SEITELMAN LAW OFFICES, P.C.

LEVITZ, MICHAEL M.

Attorney at Shulman & Hill, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

DISALVO, JOSEPH SALVATORE

Attorney at James G. Bilello & Associates

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) notion of withdrawal of motion

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) notion of withdrawal of motion; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by BILELLO AND ASSOCIATES; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/13/2018

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Magendzo, E.; Filed: 10/26/2018; Received: 10/26/2018

ORDER - OTHER dated 10/19/18

ORDER - OTHER dated 10/19/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/22/2018; Received: 10/23/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by James G. Bilello and Associates; Filed: 09/14/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Deposition Transcript - Part 3

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Deposition Transcript - Part 3; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by James G. Bilello and Associates; Filed: 09/14/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Deposition Transcript - Part 2

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Deposition Transcript - Part 2; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by James G. Bilello and Associates; Filed: 09/14/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Deposition Transcript - Part 1

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Deposition Transcript - Part 1; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by James G. Bilello and Associates; Filed: 09/14/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Deposition Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by James G. Bilello and Associates; Filed: 09/14/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Bill of Particulars

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by James G. Bilello and Associates; Filed: 09/14/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Filed By: Levitz, M.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2017; Received: 12/19/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/26/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/26/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by BILELLO AND ASSOCIATES; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

ANSWER answer

ANSWER answer; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by BILELLO AND ASSOCIATES; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) notion of withdrawal of motion; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by BILELLO AND ASSOCIATES; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Magendzo, E.; Filed: 10/26/2018; Received: 10/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 10/19/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/22/2018; Received: 10/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by James G. Bilello and Associates; Filed: 09/14/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Deposition Transcript - Part 3; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by James G. Bilello and Associates; Filed: 09/14/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Deposition Transcript - Part 2; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by James G. Bilello and Associates; Filed: 09/14/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Deposition Transcript - Part 1; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by James G. Bilello and Associates; Filed: 09/14/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by James G. Bilello and Associates; Filed: 09/14/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by James G. Bilello and Associates; Filed: 09/14/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by James G. Bilello and Associates; Filed: 09/14/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by James G. Bilello and Associates; Filed: 09/14/2018; Received: 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Filed By: Levitz, M.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/24/2018; Received: 05/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/19/2017; Received: 12/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by BILELLO AND ASSOCIATES; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER answer; Filed By: Disalvo, J. - filed by BILELLO AND ASSOCIATES; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less