This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 14:10:40 (UTC).

Michele R. Barone et al - v. - ERNEST HOFFMAN et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 Michele R Barone filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ERNEST HOFFMAN. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michele R. Barone Estate of deceased by her Executor FRANK D. BARONE

Frank D Barone individually

Defendants

Leigh-mary Hoffman

Ernest Hoffman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOLLINS, KENNETH MARC

Attorney at The Law Office of Kenneth M. Mollins, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

GALLIN, FREDRIC P

Attorney at METHFESSEL & WERBEL

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

--none--

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

Correspondence with Judge Brown confirming adjournment of deposition and conference

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

--none--

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

COURT NOTICE

--none--

COURT NOTICE

--none--

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

letter dated January 16, 2018 requesting discovery responses

EXHIBIT(S)

Discovery Demands

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons and Complaint

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH

--none--

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Gallin, F.; Filed: 08/15/2018; Received: 08/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Correspondence with Judge Brown confirming adjournment of deposition and conference; Filed By: Gallin, F.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Gallin, F.; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Gallin, F.; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) letter dated January 16, 2018 requesting discovery responses; Filed By: Gallin, F.; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Discovery Demands; Filed By: Gallin, F.; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Gallin, F.; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Gallin, F.; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001); Filed By: Gallin, F.; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Gallin, F.; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Gallin, F.; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Gallin, F.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mollins, K.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mollins, K.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less