This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 16:55:29 (UTC).

MICHAEL McEVOY Mr. - v. - VLADISLAV BALAK Mr. et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 MICHAEL McEVOY Mr filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VLADISLAV BALAK Mr. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Mcevoy MR.

Defendants

Vladislav Balak MR.

Michelle Balak MS.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVITZ, LONNY ROY

Attorney at KUHARSKI, LEVITZ & GIOVINAZZO, ESQS.

Defendant Attorney

TOOMEY, JAMES J

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JAMES J. TOOMEY

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Notice of Appeal with Information Statement

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Notice of Appeal with Information Statement; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Order with Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002); Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) Affirmation in Opposition

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 11/12/2018; Received: 11/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #002) Reply Affirmation in Support of SJ motion

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #002) Reply Affirmation in Support of SJ motion; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 11/12/2018; Received: 11/12/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #002) Exhibit 3 to Exhibit 3 Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #002) Exhibit 3 to Exhibit 3 Affidavit; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 11/12/2018; Received: 11/12/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

AFFIRMATION Attorney Verification to Defendant's Answer

AFFIRMATION Attorney Verification to Defendant's Answer; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

ANSWER Demand Pursuant to CPLR 3017(c), Answer and Discovery Demands

ANSWER Demand Pursuant to CPLR 3017(c), Answer and Discovery Demands; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Notice of Appeal with Information Statement; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002); Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 11/12/2018; Received: 11/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #002) Reply Affirmation in Support of SJ motion; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 11/12/2018; Received: 11/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #002) Exhibit 3 to Exhibit 3 Affidavit; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 11/12/2018; Received: 11/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #002) Exhibit 2 to Exhibit 3 Photos; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 11/12/2018; Received: 11/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Attorney Verification to Defendant's Answer; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Demand Pursuant to CPLR 3017(c), Answer and Discovery Demands; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levitz, L.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less