This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 04:14:13 (UTC).

Michael J. Schwanz - v. - Village of Hamburg

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 Michael J Schwanz filed an Other lawsuit against Village of Hamburg. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine Nugent Panepint. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Catherine Nugent Panepint

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael J. Schwanz

Defendant

Village of Hamburg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAMBINO, ANGELO SALVATORE

Attorney at Brown Chiari LLP

Defendant Attorneys

MCCLAREN, MICHAEL

Attorney at WEBSTER SZANYI LLP

O'NEILL, SHANNON BRAE

Attorney at WEBSTER SZANYI LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

NOTICE OF APPEAL

Notice of Appeal of Judge Nugent-Panepinto's Order (with attached Exhibit A - Notice of Entry [22] & Order [21]

NOTICE OF ENTRY

Notice of Entry of attached Order [Dkt 21]

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM

--none--

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

--none--

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT

Reply Memorandum of Law in further support of Village of Hamburg's Motion to Dismiss

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

Reply Affirmation of Shannon O'Neill in support of Village of Hamburg's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt 3]

EXHIBIT(S)

B - Def Notice of Appeal

EXHIBIT(S)

A - NOE of LFO

EXHIBIT(S)

Notice of Entry [Confirmation Notice & Dkt 23] of Judge Wojtaszek's 5/2/17 Order

EXHIBIT(S)

Judge Wojtaszek's 5/2/17 Order [Confirmation Notice & Dkt 22] granting Plaintiff's request for leave to serve a late notice of claim

EXHIBIT(S)

Plaintiff's application to serve a late notice of claim in related EC Action #812823/2016 [w-Confirmation Notice & / Dkt 1-7 & 10]

EXHIBIT(S)

O'Neill email Gambino 6-8-17 confirming 20-day extension to respond to complaint

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons & Complaint

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

of Defendant Village of Hamburg's Motion to Dismiss

NOTICE OF MOTION

To Dismiss

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 01/03/2018; Received: 01/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL Notice of Appeal of Judge Nugent-Panepinto's Order (with attached Exhibit A - Notice of Entry [22] & Order [21]; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 11/06/2017; Received: 11/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of attached Order [Dkt 21]; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Reply Memorandum of Law in further support of Village of Hamburg's Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation of Shannon O'Neill in support of Village of Hamburg's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt 3]; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) B - Def Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) A - NOE of LFO; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Attorney Affidavit in Opposition; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Notice of Claim received 5/12/17 by the Village of Hamburg, Clerk; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Notice of Entry [Confirmation Notice & Dkt 23] of Judge Wojtaszek's 5/2/17 Order; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Judge Wojtaszek's 5/2/17 Order [Confirmation Notice & Dkt 22] granting Plaintiff's request for leave to serve a late notice of claim; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Plaintiff's application to serve a late notice of claim in related EC Action #812823/2016 [w-Confirmation Notice & / Dkt 1-7 & 10]; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) O'Neill email Gambino 6-8-17 confirming 20-day extension to respond to complaint; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) of Defendant Village of Hamburg's Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) To Dismiss; Filed By: O'Neill, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gambino, A.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less