Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 15:00:51 (UTC).

Michael Ciuffo et al v. HP Bedford Arms Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Michael Ciuffo filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HP Bedford Arms Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Landicino, Pt 81. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Landicino, Pt 81

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rosaria Ciuffo

Michael Ciuffo

Defendants

HP Bedford Arms Housing Development Fund Company, Inc.

Bedford Arms L.L.C.

Bedford Arms Construction L.L.C.

Maccarone Plumbing Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHIATTO, ELIZABETH

Attorney at The Law Office of Philip P. Vogt, PLLC.

Defendant Attorneys

PELTZ, TAMAR SOROKER

Attorney at Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley

RIOS DUFFY, DORIS

Attorney at Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley

DEBERNARDIS, PHILIP JOSEPH

Attorney at CORREIA, KING , FODERA, McGINNIS & LIFERIEDGE

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE order dated 10/31/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE order dated 10/31/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Chiatto, E.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Chiatto, E.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Chiatto, E.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross Claim and Discovery Demands

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross Claim and Discovery Demands; Filed By: Debernardis, P.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) answer with cross claims

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) answer with cross claims; Filed By: Peltz, T.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Chiatto, E.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Chiatto, E.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Chiatto, E.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Chiatto, E.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Chiatto, E.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE order dated 10/31/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Chiatto, E.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Chiatto, E.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Chiatto, E.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross Claim and Discovery Demands; Filed By: Debernardis, P.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) answer with cross claims; Filed By: Peltz, T.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Chiatto, E.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Chiatto, E.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Chiatto, E.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Chiatto, E.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Chiatto, E.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less