Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 03:47:47 (UTC).

MICHAEL B. DONOHUE et al - v. - ABB, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2017 MICHAEL B DONOHUE filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ABB, INC . This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Manuel J. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Manuel J. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael B. Donohue

Anne Donohue his wife;

Defendants

JENKINS BROS., individually, as successor to and doing business as Jenkins Valve Corp.

JOHN DOE 1 through JOHN DOE 75 (fictitious)

NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, THE;

ITT LLC, individually, doing business as and successor to ITT Corporation, Bell & Gossett Company and/or Bell & Gossett Division, Flojet Corporation, The Hoffman Specialty Manufacturing Company, ITT Fluid Products Corporation, ITT Fluid Technology Co

FAIRBANKS COMPANY, THE, a California corporation, individually and as successor to The Fairbanks Company, a New Jersey Corporation

GOULDS PUMPS, LLC, individually, as successor to and doing business as Goulds Pump, Incorporated

CRANE CO., individually and as successor to and doing business as The Chapman Valve Manufacturing Co. The Deming Company, The Cochrane Corporation, The National Radiator Company, National - U.S. Radiator Corporation, Thatcher Boiler and Thatcher Furn

WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, THE;

CARRIER CORPORATION, individually, as successor to and doing business as Bryant Division of Carrier Corp., Elliott Company, International Comfort Products Corporation, International Comfort Products, LLC and Heil Heating & Cooling Products

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, individually, as successor to and doing business as Buffalo Pumps, Inc.;

CBS CORPORATION, individually, as successor to and doing business as Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Supply Company, Bonney Forge Corporation, Gulf & Western Manufacturing Company and Viacom, Inc.;

ELLIOTT COMPANY, individually, as successor to and doing business as Elliot Turbomachinery Co., Inc.

VIAD CORP., individually, as successor to and doing business as Griscom-Russell Co.

BW/IP, INC., formerly known as Borg Warner Industrial Products Inc., a former subsidiary of and successor to Borg Warner Corporation and Byron Jackson Pumps;

GRINNELL LLC, individually, as successor to and doing business as Grinnell Corporation, Grinnell Fire Protection Systems Company, Inc., ITT Grinnell Valve Co. Inc. and Kennedy Valve Mfg. Co.

The City of New York

GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, THE;

WARREN PUMPS LLC, individually, as successor to and doing business as Warren Pumps, Inc.

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BERRY, KEVIN MICHAEL

Attorney at WILENTZ GOLDMAN & SPITZER

PRYSTOWSKY, ARTHUR GALEN

Attorney at WILENTZ, GOLDMAN & SPITZER

GROUS, ANDREW MICHAEL

Attorney at Wilentz Goldman & Spitzer, PA

Defendant Attorneys

TURBERT, KEVIN WILLIAM

Attorney at Clyde & Co

DINUNZIO, PETER JAMES

Attorney at CLYDE & CO US LLP

COOK, KERRYANN MARIE

Attorney at The Cook Group, PLLC

HUGHES, BETH LYNN

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS

BANDLAMUDI, RAGHU N

Attorney at CULLEN AND DYKMAN

PEHUSH, TARA LYNNE

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

MUELLER, WILLIAM F

Attorney at CLEMENTE MUELLER, P.A.

SQUITIERI, VIRGINIA PAULA

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

VEGA, DENNIS E.

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

TANENBAUM, MICHAEL A

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

MONTBACH, FRANCIS A

Attorney at MOUND, COTTON, WOLLAN & GREENGRASS

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

Other Attorneys

KELLY, KENNETH J.

Attorney at EPSTEIN BECKER & GREEN PC

LAKHANI, NISHA SIDHARTH

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney, Ltd

PUGLIESE, DONALD R

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LLP

YAVITZ, JUDITH A

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

HANNAN, CHRISTOPHER PATRICK

Attorney at KELLEY, JASONS, MCGOWAN, SPINELLI HANNA & REBER, LLP

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Nash Engineering - Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Nash Engineering - Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 12/14/2018; Received: 12/14/2018

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Atwood & Morrill - Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Atwood & Morrill - Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 11/19/2018; Received: 11/19/2018

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Flowserve

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Flowserve; Filed By: Sorensen, B.; Filed: 10/30/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) ITT LLC

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) ITT LLC; Filed By: Hughes, B.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Goulds Pumps, LLC

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Goulds Pumps, LLC; Filed By: Hughes, B.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) CBS Stip. of Discontinuance with Prejudice

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) CBS Stip. of Discontinuance with Prejudice; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Counsel, C.; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/13/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Counsel, C.; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/13/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Grous, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Grous, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

RJI -RE: OTHER Obtain pathology

RJI -RE: OTHER Obtain pathology; Filed By: Grous, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grous, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grous, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

COMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Nash Engineering - Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 12/14/2018; Received: 12/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Atwood & Morrill - Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 11/19/2018; Received: 11/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Flowserve; Filed By: Sorensen, B.; Filed: 10/30/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) ITT LLC; Filed By: Hughes, B.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Goulds Pumps, LLC; Filed By: Hughes, B.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) CBS Stip. of Discontinuance with Prejudice; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 06/25/2018; Received: 06/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Counsel, C.; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Counsel, C.; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Def't Crane Co.; Filed By: Pehush, T.; Filed: 03/30/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Grous, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Grous, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Grous, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER Obtain pathology; Filed By: Grous, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grous, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grous, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Berry, K. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less