This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 16:45:10 (UTC).

MICHAEL AZIMOV v. NATIONAL GRID ENERGY MANAGEMENT, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 MICHAEL AZIMOV filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NATIONAL GRID ENERGY MANAGEMENT, LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Lorna Mcallister. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Lorna Mcallister

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Azimov

Defendants

THE BROOKLYN UNION GAS COMPANY DBA NATIONAL GRID N.Y.

NATIONAL GRID ENERGY MANAGEMENT, LLC

Blend Bekteshi

KEYSPAN ENERGY CORPORATION MANAGEMENT LLC

THE HALLEN CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.

Brikena Bekteshi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAGER, WILLIAM

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM PAGER

Defendant Attorneys

CRAFA, JOSEPH R.

Attorney at Joseph R. Crafa, PC

KRITZER, DAVID SCOTT

Attorney at DAVID S. KRITZER & ASSOCIATES

TOOMEY, JAMES J

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JAMES J. TOOMEY

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

dated 2/28/20

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Bill of Particulars, Response to Defendant's Demands

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Bill of Particulars, Response to Defendant's Demands; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Reply to Cross-Claim of defendant National Grid Energy Management, LLC, The Brooklyn Union Gas Compa ... show more

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Reply to Cross-Claim of defendant National Grid Energy Management, LLC, The Brooklyn Union Gas Compa ... show more; Filed By: Kritzer, D. - filed by Kritzer Law Group; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Reply to Cross-Claim of defendant The Hallen Construction

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Reply to Cross-Claim of defendant The Hallen Construction; Filed By: Kritzer, D. - filed by Kritzer Law Group; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) order dtd 1/8/2020 signed by Hon. King. Plaintiff's motion granted no opp.

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) order dtd 1/8/2020 signed by Hon. King. Plaintiff's motion granted no opp.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Defendants, Blend Bekteshi and Brikena Bekteshi's good faith letters

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Defendants, Blend Bekteshi and Brikena Bekteshi's good faith letters; Filed By: Kritzer, D. - filed by Kritzer Law Group; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dated 2/28/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/03/2020; Received: 04/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Bill of Particulars, Response to Defendant's Demands; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Reply to Cross-Claim of defendant National Grid Energy Management, LLC, The Brooklyn Union Gas Company d/b/a National Grid NY and Keyspan Energy Corporation; Filed By: Kritzer, D. - filed by Kritzer Law Group; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Reply to Cross-Claim of defendant The Hallen Construction; Filed By: Kritzer, D. - filed by Kritzer Law Group; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) order dtd 1/8/2020 signed by Hon. King. Plaintiff's motion granted no opp.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Defendants, Blend Bekteshi and Brikena Bekteshi's good faith letters; Filed By: Kritzer, D. - filed by Kritzer Law Group; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Defendants, Blend Bekteshi and Brikena Bekteshi's answer; Filed By: Kritzer, D. - filed by Kritzer Law Group; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Pager, W.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less