This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 20:18:00 (UTC).

MetLab Corp. - v. - Vasily Gladky et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 MetLab Corp filed an Other lawsuit against Vasily Gladky. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MetLab Corp.

Defendants

Metallography World Corporation, d/b/a Metallurgical Supplies

Vasily Gladky

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLACK, RICHARD A.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD A. CLACK

Defendant Attorneys

BRENNAN, TERRANCE C.

Attorney at TERRANCE C. BRENNAN

SILVERBERG, DAVID KEITH

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF SILVERBERG AND SILVERBERG, L.L.P.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Silverberg, D.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Silverberg, D.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION

NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Silverberg, D.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

EXTENSION

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

FINAL

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM

--none--

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

--none--

ORDER - OTHER

re: confidential info.

EXHIBIT(S)

Exemplar

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

Consent to Change Attorney (Substitution)

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

--none--

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

--none--

ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Silverberg, D.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Silverberg, D.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Silverberg, D.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING EXTENSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING FINAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/10/2018; Received: 09/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002); Filed By: Clack, R.; Filed: 08/30/2018; Received: 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER re: confidential info.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2018; Received: 07/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #002) Exemplar; Filed By: Silverberg, D.; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #002) Correspondence to R Clack of April 23, 2018; Filed By: Silverberg, D.; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Produce Documents; Filed By: Silverberg, D.; Filed: 11/29/2017; Received: 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney (Substitution); Filed By: Silverberg, D.; Filed: 10/06/2017; Received: 10/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Brennan, T.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C); Filed By: Clack, R.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Clack, R.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Lennon, J.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Clack, R.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Clack, R.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Clack, R.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less