This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 14:48:34 (UTC).

MEREDITH JACOBS et al - v. - METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2017 MEREDITH JACOBS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Meredith Jacobs

Fred Lee

Defendants

MTA NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY

LONG ISLAND RAILROAD

METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY a/k/a MTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOLZBERG, ZACHARY IAN

Attorney at DEREK SMITH LAW GROUP, PLLC

LIGGIERI, PAUL

Attorney at L & D LAW P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

NOLAN, KRISTEN MARY

Attorney at NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY

MCCAFFREY, KEVIN P.

Attorney at LONG ISLAND RAIL ROAD COMPANY

 

Court Documents

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

--none--

NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE

--none--

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

Seq. Nos. 001 and 002

AFFIDAVIT

Affidavit of Service

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Amended Complaint

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION

--none--

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION

Stipulation for extension of time to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Sample Ticket

EXHIBIT(S)

Tariff

EXHIBIT(S)

Complaint

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

Affirmation of Kevin McCaffrey

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

--none--

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

Voluntary Dismissal Against MTA New York City Transit

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Mccaffrey, K.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mccaffrey, K.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) Seq. Nos. 001 and 002; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2018; Received: 07/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Mccaffrey, K.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002); Filed By: Mccaffrey, K.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Amended Complaint; Filed By: Liggieri, P.; Filed: 02/21/2018; Received: 02/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002); Filed By: Liggieri, P.; Filed: 02/21/2018; Received: 02/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Stipulation for extension of time to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Liggieri, P.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #002); Filed By: Mccaffrey, K.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Mccaffrey, K.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Mark D. Hoffer, Esq.; Filed By: Mccaffrey, K.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Sample Ticket; Filed By: Mccaffrey, K.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Tariff; Filed By: Mccaffrey, K.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Complaint; Filed By: Mccaffrey, K.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Kevin McCaffrey; Filed By: Mccaffrey, K.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Mccaffrey, K.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Nolan, K.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Voluntary Dismissal Against MTA New York City Transit; Filed By: Nolan, K.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Mccaffrey, K.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Holzberg, Z.; Filed: 06/10/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less