This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 22:06:43 (UTC).

MELROSE CREDIT UNION, - v. - SAREER A. SAYAR

Case Summary

On 05/31/2017 MELROSE CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SAREER A SAYAR. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MELROSE CREDIT UNION,

Defendant

Sareer A. Sayar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DELL'AMORE, FRANK C

Attorney at JASPAN SCHLESINGER LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/28/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Order; Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Lateness

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Lateness; Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #001) Costs of Plaintiff

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #001) Costs of Plaintiff; Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT (Motion #001) Notice of Settlement with Proposed Judgment

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT (Motion #001) Notice of Settlement with Proposed Judgment; Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

ORDER - RECUSAL mll sfo recusal dtd 10/26/17

ORDER - RECUSAL mll sfo recusal dtd 10/26/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/01/2017; Received: 11/01/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint on Sareer A. Sayar

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint on Sareer A. Sayar; Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - G UCC-1 Financing Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - G UCC-1 Financing Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - F Second Loan Security Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - F Second Loan Security Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E Second Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - E Second Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D Letter dated May 24, 2017 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D Letter dated May 24, 2017 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C UCC-1 Financing Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C UCC-1 Financing Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B First Loan Security Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B First Loan Security Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A First Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A First Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/28/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Order; Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Lateness; Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (Motion #001) Costs of Plaintiff; Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT (Motion #001) Notice of Settlement with Proposed Judgment; Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - RECUSAL mll sfo recusal dtd 10/26/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/01/2017; Received: 11/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice Pursuant to CPLR Section 3215; Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint on Sareer A. Sayar; Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G UCC-1 Financing Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Second Loan Security Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Second Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Letter dated May 24, 2017 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C UCC-1 Financing Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B First Loan Security Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A First Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Dell'Amore, F.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less