This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:10:23 (UTC).

MELISSA VEGA - v. - 203 WYCKOFF HOLDINGS LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 MELISSA VEGA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 203 WYCKOFF HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melissa Vega

Defendants

Victor Bravo AS MANAGING AGENT

203 WYCKOFF HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDER, MARK

Attorney at HARMON, LINDER & ROGOWSKY, ESQS.

Defendant Attorneys

LAGATTUTA, PAUL F

Attorney at FIXLER & LAGATTUTA, LLP

PINCUS, JONATHAN JACOB

Attorney at FIXLER & LAGATTUTA, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ORDER - OTHER dated 8/14/19

ORDER - OTHER dated 8/14/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Lagattuta, P.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Lagattuta, P.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Answer; Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) Dated 1/15/20

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) Dated 1/15/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Lagattuta, P.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) Dated 1/15/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Answer; Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 8/14/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Note of Issue; Filed By: Pincus, J.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Demands; Filed By: Lagattuta, P.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Lagattuta, P.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Lagattuta, P.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Lagattuta, P.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less