This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 22:02:58 (UTC).

MELISSA M. BESNER - v. - HOLLY M. STRICKHORN et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2017 MELISSA M BESNER filed an Other lawsuit against HOLLY M STRICKHORN. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1798

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melissa M. Besner

Defendants

Holly M. Strickhorn

Lawrne A. Frink

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CANEPA, JOSEPH ANTHONY

Attorney at William Mattar, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

GRAFF, KEVIN JAY

Attorney at Law Offices of Jennifer S. Adams

MILLER, KEITH DOUGLAS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF KEITH D. MILLER

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Miller, K.; Filed: 06/26/2018; Received: 06/26/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Hearing scheduled for November 13, 2017.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Hearing scheduled for November 13, 2017.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Further Support of Motion and in Opposition to Cross-Motion

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Further Support of Motion and in Opposition to Cross-Motion; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 10/18/2017; Received: 10/18/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) Email to Defense with Skip Trace Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) Email to Defense with Skip Trace Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) Email to Defense Counsel

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) Email to Defense Counsel; Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Affidavit of Non Service

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Affidavit of Non Service; Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) police report

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) police report; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Miller, K.; Filed: 06/02/2017; Received: 06/02/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Miller, K.; Filed: 06/26/2018; Received: 06/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Hearing scheduled for November 13, 2017.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Further Support of Motion and in Opposition to Cross-Motion; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 10/18/2017; Received: 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) Email to Defense with Skip Trace Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) Email to Defense Counsel; Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Affidavit of Non Service; Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Skip Trace Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) police report; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Miller, K.; Filed: 06/02/2017; Received: 06/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Canepa, J.; Filed: 04/26/2017; Received: 04/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less