This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 01/20/2023 at 05:10:06 (UTC).

Melissa Falloon et al v. Rhonda Haussmann

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 Melissa Falloon filed an Other lawsuit against Rhonda Haussmann. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor G Grossman. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Victor G Grossman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Melissa Falloon as parent and natural guardian of D.F.

D. F. an infant under the age of 14 years

Defendant

Rhonda Haussmann

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FENDT, ERIC GARY

 

Court Documents

PETITION *Corrected* Infant Compromise Petition

PETITION *Corrected* Infant Compromise Petition; Filed By: Fendt, E.; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

RJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE *Corrected*

RJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE *Corrected*; Filed By: Fendt, E.; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Fendt, E.; Filed: 06/01/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1); Filed By: Fendt, E.; Filed: 06/01/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed Infant's Compromise Order

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed Infant's Compromise Order; Filed By: Fendt, E.; Filed: 06/01/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A to Petition - Hudson Valley Hospital Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A to Petition - Hudson Valley Hospital Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Fendt, E.; Filed: 06/01/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B to Petition - Caremount Medical Records Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B to Petition - Caremount Medical Records Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Fendt, E.; Filed: 06/01/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED INFANT COMPROMISE PROCEEDING

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED INFANT COMPROMISE PROCEEDING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/03/2022; Received: 06/02/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST

ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST; Filed By: Fendt, E.; Filed: 06/15/2022; Received: 06/15/2022

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/28/2022; Received: 06/28/2022

ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE

ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/03/2022; Received: 08/03/2022

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/03/2022; Received: 08/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/28/2022; Received: 06/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST; Filed By: Fendt, E.; Filed: 06/15/2022; Received: 06/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 06/08/2022; Received: 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED INFANT COMPROMISE PROCEEDING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/03/2022; Received: 06/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B to Petition - Caremount Medical Records Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Fendt, E.; Filed: 06/01/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A to Petition - Hudson Valley Hospital Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Fendt, E.; Filed: 06/01/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed Infant's Compromise Order; Filed By: Fendt, E.; Filed: 06/01/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1); Filed By: Fendt, E.; Filed: 06/01/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Fendt, E.; Filed: 06/01/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE *Corrected*; Filed By: Fendt, E.; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION *Corrected* Infant Compromise Petition; Filed By: Fendt, E.; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 06/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less