This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 13:50:45 (UTC).

Melanie Saninocencio - v. - Wharton Properties, LLC., et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 Melanie Saninocencio filed an Other lawsuit against Wharton Properties, LLC . This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******017E

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melanie Saninocencio

Defendants and Petitioners

Wharton Properties, LLC., its agents, servants, and/or employees, a/k/a Wharton Properties Debt., LLC., its agents, servants, and/or employees, a/k/a WHARTON PROPERTIES (BVI) LIMITED, its agents, servants, and/or employees,

THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION, its agents, servants, and/or employees

Respondent

AE Outfitters Retail Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIBETZ, URIEL E

Attorney at URIEL E GRIBETZ ESQ

Petitioner Attorney

BRIAN JOHN DALTON

Defendant Attorneys

TORRINI, LAPO

Attorney at Babchick & Young LLP

WAGNER, KAREN LEE

Attorney at BABCHIK & YOUNG, LLP

Young, Bruce Mark

Attorney at Babchik & Young, LLP

ROBINS, ALEXANDRA LEE

Attorney at Babchik & Young, LLP

DALTON, BRIAN JOHN

Attorney at CARTAFALSA, SLATTERY, TURPIN & LENOFF

Respondent Attorney

WILLIAM CODY LAWLOR RIAD HAMAI

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: FEBRUARY 3, 2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: FEBRUARY 3, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #004) Order with Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #004) Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Gribetz, U.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

DEMAND FOR: Notice of Expert Pursuant to Section 3101(d)

DEMAND FOR: Notice of Expert Pursuant to Section 3101(d); Filed By: Gribetz, U.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004) SHORT FORM ORDER & ORDER DATED 10/21/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004) SHORT FORM ORDER & ORDER DATED 10/21/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

ORDER - INTERIM (Motion #004) DATED 10/21/2019

ORDER - INTERIM (Motion #004) DATED 10/21/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Defendant's letter to Plaintiff

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Defendant's letter to Plaintiff; Filed By: Gribetz, U.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Order; Filed By: Gribetz, U.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004) Affirmation in Opposition to Motion

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004) Affirmation in Opposition to Motion; Filed By: Gribetz, U.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #004) Plaintiff's counsel's letter of 8.7.19

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #004) Plaintiff's counsel's letter of 8.7.19; Filed By: Torrini, L.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Special Damages

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Special Damages; Filed By: Young, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Social Media Information

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Social Media Information; Filed By: Young, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations; Filed By: Young, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notices of Deposition (2)

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notices of Deposition (2); Filed By: Young, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery and Inspection for Expert Witness Information

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery and Inspection for Expert Witness Information; Filed By: Young, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Young, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

ANSWER verified Answer to Amended Verified Complaint

ANSWER verified Answer to Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Young, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of service; Filed By: Gribetz, U.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Gribetz, U.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

104 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: FEBRUARY 3, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #004) Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Gribetz, U.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Notice of Expert Pursuant to Section 3101(d); Filed By: Gribetz, U.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004) SHORT FORM ORDER & ORDER DATED 10/21/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - INTERIM (Motion #004) DATED 10/21/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Defendant's letter to Plaintiff; Filed By: Gribetz, U.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Order; Filed By: Gribetz, U.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004) Affirmation in Opposition to Motion; Filed By: Gribetz, U.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #004) Plaintiff's counsel's letter of 8.7.19; Filed By: Torrini, L.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #004) TKE's Letter to Plaintiff dated 8.5.19; Filed By: Torrini, L.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Mandatory Insurer Law Pursuant to Section 111 of Public Law 110-173; Filed By: Young, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Special Damages; Filed By: Young, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Social Media Information; Filed By: Young, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations; Filed By: Young, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notices of Deposition (2); Filed By: Young, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery and Inspection for Expert Witness Information; Filed By: Young, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Young, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER verified Answer to Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Young, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of service; Filed By: Gribetz, U.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Gribetz, U.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less