This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:04:44 (UTC).

McGraw Hill Federal Credit Union - v. - Carla McLeod

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 McGraw Hill Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Carla McLeod. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

McGraw Hill Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Carla Mcleod

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OSTROWITZ, ALAN R

Attorney at OSTROWITZ & OSTROWITZ

MARCUS, JENNIFER M

Attorney at OSTROWITZ & OSTROWITZ ESQS.

MARCUS, JENNIFER MARIE

Attorney at OSTROWITZ & OSTROWITZ ESQS.

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1) Affidavit of facts and non military search

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1) Affidavit of facts and non military search; Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A-B (Motion #1) Summons and complaint and proof of service and add mail

EXHIBIT(S) - A-B (Motion #1) Summons and complaint and proof of service and add mail; Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ostrowitz, A. - filed by Bulldog Process Service; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) original proposed order submitted with default motion in 2017

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) original proposed order submitted with default motion in 2017; Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) pursuant to Decision and Order entered 8/29/19

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) pursuant to Decision and Order entered 8/29/19; Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A-B (Motion #3) Report of referee and merger notice

EXHIBIT(S) - A-B (Motion #3) Report of referee and merger notice; Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) also relates to motion to confirm report of referee

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) also relates to motion to confirm report of referee; Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) dated 8/5/19

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) dated 8/5/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowitz, A. - filed by Bulldog Process Service; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ostrowitz, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1); Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) also for motion to confirm

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) also for motion to confirm; Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) original proposed order submitted with default motion in 2017; Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) pursuant to Decision and Order entered 8/29/19; Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) also for motion to confirm; Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) also relates to motion to confirm report of referee; Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) dated 8/5/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-B (Motion #3) Report of referee and merger notice; Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-B (Motion #1) Summons and complaint and proof of service and add mail; Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1) Affidavit of facts and non military search; Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1); Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Marcus, J.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowitz, A. - filed by Bulldog Process Service; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ostrowitz, A. - filed by Bulldog Process Service; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ostrowitz, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less