This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/16/2020 at 02:26:30 (UTC).

MCA FIXED PAYMENT, LLC - v. - NBS GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC. et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 MCA FIXED PAYMENT, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NBS GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCA FIXED PAYMENT, LLC

Defendants

NBS GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC.

Jorge Norena

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BILOTTI, DOUGLAS JOSEPH

Attorney at Douglas J. Bilotti, Esq.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A 3215 NOTICE

EXHIBIT(S) - A 3215 NOTICE; Filed By: Bilotti, D.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Bilotti, D.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Bilotti, D. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JORGE NORENA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JORGE NORENA; Filed By: Bilotti, D. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NBS GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NBS GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC.; Filed By: Bilotti, D. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B ASSURANCES AGREEMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - B ASSURANCES AGREEMENT; Filed By: Bilotti, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A ADVANCE AGREEMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A ADVANCE AGREEMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bilotti, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bilotti, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A 3215 NOTICE; Filed By: Bilotti, D.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Bilotti, D.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Bilotti, D. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JORGE NORENA; Filed By: Bilotti, D. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NBS GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC.; Filed By: Bilotti, D. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B ASSURANCES AGREEMENT; Filed By: Bilotti, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A ADVANCE AGREEMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bilotti, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bilotti, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less