Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 22:28:24 (UTC).

MAURICE HOLNESS v. 244 HOWARD AVE LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2019 MAURICE HOLNESS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 244 HOWARD AVE LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Peter Paul Sweeney, Pt73. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Peter Paul Sweeney, Pt73

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maurice Holness

Defendants

244 HOWARD AVE LLC

Y&Z DEVELOPERS INC.

Not Yet Classified

Alexander Marquez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARBER, GREG

Defendant Attorneys

CURRAN, FRANCIS M

Attorney at Kudman Trachten Aloe LLP

FERMOSO, ALEX

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

MAXWELL, JOEL MICHAEL

Attorney at Marks, O'Neill, O'Brien, Doherty & Kelly

ALLEN, MONIQUE ANTIONETTE

Attorney at AHMUTY DEMERS & MCMANUS

EDWARDS, JAMES

Attorney at AHMUTY DEMERS & MCMANUS

PERKEL, STEVEN ROSS

Attorney at Ahmuty, Demers & McManus, Esqs.

Not Yet Classified Attorney

gastman, gregory

Attorney at Gorayeb & Associates, PC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Garber, G.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

ORDER - JOINT TRIAL (Motion #1) index 500826/19 & 502337/19 are joined for trial

ORDER - JOINT TRIAL (Motion #1) index 500826/19 & 502337/19 are joined for trial; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Gorayeb & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Gorayeb & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Gorayeb & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Verified Answer - 244 Howard Avenue (Marquez)

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Verified Answer - 244 Howard Avenue (Marquez); Filed By: Allen, M.; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Verified Answer - Y&Z (Marquez)

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Verified Answer - Y&Z (Marquez); Filed By: Allen, M.; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Garber, G.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

ANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Verified Answer

ANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Verified Answer; Filed By: Edwards, J.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer; Filed By: Maxwell, J.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer; Filed By: Edwards, J.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Garber, G. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garber, G. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Garber, G. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Garber, G.; Filed: 01/13/2019; Received: 01/13/2019

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Garber, G.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - JOINT TRIAL (Motion #1) index 500826/19 & 502337/19 are joined for trial; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Gorayeb & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Gorayeb & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Gorayeb & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Verified Answer - 244 Howard Avenue (Marquez); Filed By: Allen, M.; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Verified Answer - Y&Z (Marquez); Filed By: Allen, M.; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Summons and Verified Complaint (Marquez); Filed By: Allen, M.; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Curran, F.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Garber, G.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Verified Answer; Filed By: Edwards, J.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer; Filed By: Maxwell, J.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer; Filed By: Edwards, J.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Garber, G. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garber, G. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Garber, G. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Garber, G.; Filed: 01/13/2019; Received: 01/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less