Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 23:17:05 (UTC).

MAURICE BAKER et al - v. - OMAR PEREZ

Case Summary

On 06/01/2017 MAURICE BAKER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OMAR PEREZ. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******017E

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maurice Baker

Jeannine Baker

Defendant

Omar Perez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYNECKI, SCOTT E

Attorney at RUBENSTEIN & RYNECKI ESQS

Defendant Attorney

FRANKEL, BRIAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DENNIS C. BARTLING

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. D. Gonzalez

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. D. Gonzalez; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 1/18/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 1/18/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Good Faith Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Good Faith Letter; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Post EBT Demands

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Post EBT Demands; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Pleadings; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) Affirmation of Good Faith

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 09/27/2018; Received: 09/27/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 7/13/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 7/13/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 1/10/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 1/10/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/19/2018; Received: 01/19/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected* Request for a Preliminary conference & rji

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected* Request for a Preliminary conference & rji; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST *Corrected* PC Request and Affidavit of Service

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST *Corrected* PC Request and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Frankel, B. - filed by Boulachian, A.; Filed: 10/06/2017; Received: 10/06/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Frankel, B. - filed by Boulachian, A.; Filed: 10/06/2017; Received: 10/06/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. D. Gonzalez; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 1/18/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Good Faith Letter; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Post EBT Demands; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Pleadings; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 09/27/2018; Received: 09/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 7/13/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 1/10/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/19/2018; Received: 01/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected* Request for a Preliminary conference & rji; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST *Corrected* PC Request and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Frankel, B. - filed by Boulachian, A.; Filed: 10/06/2017; Received: 10/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Frankel, B. - filed by Boulachian, A.; Filed: 10/06/2017; Received: 10/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit for service of the Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rynecki, S.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less