This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/13/2021 at 09:28:00 (UTC).

MAUREEN FENTON v. 1111 MARCUS AVENUE UNIT 2 OWNER, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 MAUREEN FENTON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 1111 MARCUS AVENUE UNIT 2 OWNER, LLC. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maureen Fenton

Defendants

1111 MARCUS AVENUE UNIT 2 OWNER, LLC

1111 MARCUS AVENUE UNIT 3 OWNER, LLC

WRD MARCUS AVENUE A, LLC

NORTHWELL HEALTH INC.

JOHN DOE (1-5)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIANCANELLO, MICHAEL PATRICK

Attorney at Law Office of Michael P. Biancanello, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

DILUCCIO, JEFFREY M.

Attorney at KERLEY WALSH MATERA & CINQUEMANI

 

Court Documents

ANSWER Verified Answer to AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT with EBT Notice

ANSWER Verified Answer to AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT with EBT Notice; Filed By: Diluccio, J.; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 09/29/2021

ANSWER Verified Answer with accompanying Demands

ANSWER Verified Answer with accompanying Demands; Filed By: Diluccio, J.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1111 Marcus Ave Unit 2 Owner LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1111 Marcus Ave Unit 2 Owner LLC; Filed By: Biancanello, M.; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WRD Marcus Ave A LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WRD Marcus Ave A LLC; Filed By: Biancanello, M.; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 111 Marcus Ave Unit 3 LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 111 Marcus Ave Unit 3 LLC; Filed By: Biancanello, M.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Northwell Health

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Northwell Health; Filed By: Biancanello, M.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

SUPPORTING PLEADINGS Verification Complaint

SUPPORTING PLEADINGS Verification Complaint; Filed By: Biancanello, M.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Biancanello, M.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer to AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT with EBT Notice; Filed By: Diluccio, J.; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 09/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer with accompanying Demands; Filed By: Diluccio, J.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1111 Marcus Ave Unit 2 Owner LLC; Filed By: Biancanello, M.; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WRD Marcus Ave A LLC; Filed By: Biancanello, M.; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 111 Marcus Ave Unit 3 LLC; Filed By: Biancanello, M.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Northwell Health; Filed By: Biancanello, M.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPORTING PLEADINGS Verification Complaint; Filed By: Biancanello, M.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Biancanello, M.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less