Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 18:43:56 (UTC).

Maureen Austin as Executor of the Estate of et al v. St. Francis Hospital, Roslyn, New York et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 Maureen Austin as Executor of the Estate of filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against St Francis Hospital, Roslyn, New York. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maureen Austin as Executor of the Estate of

Edward Dougherty DECEASED

Defendants

Bridge View Nursing Home, Inc.

Glen Cove Hospital

Glengariff Holding Corp. d/b/a Glengariff Healthcare Center

St. Francis Hospital, Roslyn, New York

Clearview Operating Co., LLC d/b/a The Grand Rehabilitation and Nursing at Queens

Glengariff Holding, LLC d/b/a Glengariff Healthcare Center

Flushing Hospital and Medical Center

The Glengariff Corporation d/b/a Glengariff Healthcare Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FREEMAN, DAVID MERRILL

Attorney at PHILIP J. RIZZUTO, P.C.

RIZZUTO, PHILIP JOHN

Attorney at The Rizzuto Law Firm

Defendant Attorneys

NICHOLS, JEFFREY ROBERT

Attorney at VIGORITO, BARKER, PATTERSON, NICHOLS & PORTER, LLP

CONGER, JORDAN COURTNEY

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP

COJUANGCO, GABRIELLE ECHAUS

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

HIRSCH, IRVING B

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELAMN & DICKER

MATERA, MATTHEW SCOTT

Attorney at Wilson Elser

STATHATOS, GERASIMIA

Attorney at Vigorito, Barker, Porter & Patterson, LLP

SHEELEY, ANDREW THOMAS

Attorney at Sheeley LLP

RYAN, MICHAEL PAUL

Attorney at Sheeley LLP

BARKER, JOHN WILLIAM

Attorney at Vigorito, Barker, Porter, Moody & Patterson, LLP

MALONEY, LAUREN N.

Attorney at Vigorito, Barker, Porter, & Patterson LLP

DOLAN, PATRICK ANDREW

Attorney at Maguire Cardona PC

SLEVIN, MARIBETH

Attorney at KAUFMAN, BORGEEST & RYAN LLP

SMALL, ERIC J.

Attorney at Kaufman, Borgeest & Ryan, LLP

ROBIN, CAITLIN ANNE

Attorney at CAITLIN ROBIN AND ASSOCIATES PLLC

BERGER, JACQUELINE DIANE

Attorney at MARTIN, CLEARWATER & BELL

DEROSA, MICHAEL ANTHONY

Attorney at Martin Clearwater & Bell LLP

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations; Filed By: Ryan, M.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

BILL OF PARTICULARS Verified Bill of Particulars as to Glengariff

BILL OF PARTICULARS Verified Bill of Particulars as to Glengariff; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses - Glen Cove Hospital

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses - Glen Cove Hospital; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses - The Grand

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses - The Grand; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses - Bridge View

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses - Bridge View; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses - Flushing Hospital

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses - Flushing Hospital; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rizzuto, P. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rizzuto, P. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rizzuto, P. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rizzuto, P. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rizzuto, P. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rizzuto, P. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rizzuto, P. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations; Filed By: Ryan, M.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS Verified Bill of Particulars as to Glengariff; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses - Glen Cove Hospital; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses - The Grand; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses - Bridge View; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses - Flushing Hospital; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses - Glengariff; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rizzuto, P. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rizzuto, P. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rizzuto, P. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rizzuto, P. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rizzuto, P. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rizzuto, P. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rizzuto, P. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rizzuto, P. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Freeman, D.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less