This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 03/20/2023 at 17:16:33 (UTC).

Matthew M Deedy v. Town Board of Town of Clayton NY et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 Matthew M Deedy filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Town Board of Town of Clayton NY. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James P Mcclusky. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1993

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James P Mcclusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew M Deedy

Defendants

Town Board of Town of Clayton NY

Town of Clayton, Jefferson County

Kimberli Johnston Assessor of the Town of Clayton

Not Yet Classified

Thousand Islands Central School

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURROWS, JAMES A.

Defendant Attorneys

ALMY, STEPHEN MARK

VINCELETTE, DANIEL GERARD

Not Yet Classified Attorney

JERAM, WALTER MCEWAN

 

Court Documents

PETITION Verified Petition

PETITION Verified Petition; Filed By: Burrows, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) Notice of Petition

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) Notice of Petition; Filed By: Burrows, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Burrows, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service (3)

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service (3); Filed By: Burrows, J.; Filed: 08/05/2022; Received: 08/05/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Jeram, W.; Filed: 09/15/2022; Received: 09/15/2022

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2022; Received: 09/16/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Appearance letter to clerk

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Appearance letter to clerk; Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 11/07/2022; Received: 11/07/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Appearance letter to counsel

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Appearance letter to counsel; Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 11/07/2022; Received: 11/07/2022

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge; Filed By: Vincelette, D.; Filed: 11/15/2022; Received: 11/15/2022

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Consent Judgment

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Consent Judgment; Filed By: Vincelette, D.; Filed: 11/15/2022; Received: 11/15/2022

ORDER - OTHER Consent Order and Judgment of Settlement

ORDER - OTHER Consent Order and Judgment of Settlement; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/17/2022; Received: 11/17/2022

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 11/18/2022; Received: 11/18/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 11/18/2022; Received: 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Consent Order and Judgment of Settlement; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/17/2022; Received: 11/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Consent Judgment; Filed By: Vincelette, D.; Filed: 11/15/2022; Received: 11/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge; Filed By: Vincelette, D.; Filed: 11/15/2022; Received: 11/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Appearance letter to counsel; Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 11/07/2022; Received: 11/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Appearance letter to clerk; Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 11/07/2022; Received: 11/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2022; Received: 09/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Jeram, W.; Filed: 09/15/2022; Received: 09/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service (3); Filed By: Burrows, J.; Filed: 08/05/2022; Received: 08/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Burrows, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) Notice of Petition; Filed By: Burrows, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Verified Petition; Filed By: Burrows, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less