This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/01/2020 at 14:52:55 (UTC).

mary Nelson v. Dennis Miller et al

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 mary Nelson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dennis Miller. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James Dillon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0988

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Chautauqua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James Dillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Nelson

Defendants

Dennis Miller

COLBURNS HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING INC

Renee Miller-lilly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEWITT, JULIE BURDICK

Attorney at LAW-NY

Defendant Attorney

CALIMERI, JOSEPH MICHAEL

Attorney at Wright, Wright and Hampton

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Order

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Order; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Affidavit of Renee-Miller Lilly

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Affidavit of Renee-Miller Lilly; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Affidavit of Joseph M. Calimeri, Esq.

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Affidavit of Joseph M. Calimeri, Esq.; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Affidavit of Julie Hewitt, Esq.

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Affidavit of Julie Hewitt, Esq.; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Complaint; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Attorney Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Attorney Affidavit; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Receipt

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Receipt; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Early Occupancy Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Early Occupancy Agreement; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Real estate contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Real estate contract; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Unsigned OSC

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Unsigned OSC; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER TRO

RJI -RE: OTHER TRO; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Attorney Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Attorney Affidavit; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Letter from Calimeri

EXHIBIT(S) - D Letter from Calimeri; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Addendum to Remove inspection Contingency

EXHIBIT(S) - C Addendum to Remove inspection Contingency; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B early Occupancy Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - B early Occupancy Agreement; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Purchase Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Purchase Agreement; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

COMPLAINT Complaint/ injunctive relief

COMPLAINT Complaint/ injunctive relief; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE *Corrected* Summons with Notice

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE *Corrected* Summons with Notice; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Order; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Affidavit of Renee-Miller Lilly; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Affidavit of Joseph M. Calimeri, Esq.; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Affidavit of Julie Hewitt, Esq.; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Complaint; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Attorney Affidavit; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Receipt; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Early Occupancy Agreement; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Real estate contract; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Affidavit of Renee Miller-Lilly; Filed By: Calimeri, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Unsigned OSC; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Osc with TRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER TRO; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Attorney Affidavit; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Letter from Calimeri; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Addendum to Remove inspection Contingency; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B early Occupancy Agreement; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Purchase Agreement; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Complaint/ injunctive relief; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE *Corrected* Summons with Notice; Filed By: Hewitt, J.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less