This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 18:01:17 (UTC).

MARY HENDRICKS v. WAYNE CENTER FOR NURSING & REHABILITATION et al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 MARY HENDRICKS filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against WAYNE CENTER FOR NURSING REHABILITATION. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is George J. Silver - Gjs6. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

George J. Silver - Gjs6

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Hendricks

Defendants

WAYNE CENTER FOR NURSING & REHABILITATION

WORKMEN'S CIRCLE MULTICARE CENTER

MONTIFIORE MEDICAL CENTER and

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRENTSEL, STEVEN

Attorney at KRENTSEL & GUZMAN, LLP.

HERBERT, JASON TODD

Attorney at KRENTSEL & GUZMAN LLP

Defendant Attorneys

MCCRINK, KATHERINE L

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN &

VISCO, DAVID ANDREW

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

GREENE, SHEVONNE SHANAI

Attorney at Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP

STEA TURIANO, CHRISTINE A

Attorney at KAUFMAN BORGEEST & RYAN LLP

MANDELL, JACQUELINE

Attorney at KAUFMAN, BORGEEST & RYAN

LUCA, PATRICIA A.

Attorney at LUCA LAW, PLLC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 11/6/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 11/6/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

NOTICE OF APPEAL Notice of Appeal

NOTICE OF APPEAL Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Mandell, J.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

ORDER - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 9/24/2019

ORDER - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 9/24/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Def's Reply Affirmation to Plaintiff's Opposition 9.3.19

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Def's Reply Affirmation to Plaintiff's Opposition 9.3.19; Filed By: Greene, S.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Hospital Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Hospital Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Stea Turiano, C.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stea Turiano, C.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Stea Turiano, C.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Herbert, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herbert, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herbert, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herbert, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Krentsel, S. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Krentsel, S. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 11/6/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Mandell, J.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 9/24/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Def's Reply Affirmation to Plaintiff's Opposition 9.3.19; Filed By: Greene, S.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Hospital Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Herbert, J.; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stea Turiano, C.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Stea Turiano, C.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stea Turiano, C.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Stea Turiano, C.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Herbert, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herbert, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herbert, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Herbert, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Krentsel, S. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Krentsel, S. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less