Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 13:13:12 (UTC).

Mary Ann Kemnitzer et al v. Mercy Hospital of Buffalo et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Mary Ann Kemnitzer filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Mercy Hospital of Buffalo. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Frederick J Marshall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Frederick J Marshall

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mary Ann Kemnitzer

Robert Kemnitzer

Defendants

Mercy Hospital of Buffalo

Daniel Patterson d.o.

Catholic Health System

John L O'donnell m.d.

Aislinn M Scarbinsky d.o.

Buffalo Medical Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNAUTH, BRIAN DAVID

Attorney at LoTempio Law Group P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

VISCO, JOHN MICHAEL

ZITTEL, MELISSA LEE

Attorney at GIBSON, MCASKILL & CROSBY

SWEET, KATHLEEN MARIE

Attorney at GIBSON, MCASKILL & CROSBY

 

Court Documents

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

--none--

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Good faith email

EXHIBIT(S)

Defendants Discovery Demands

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer

EXHIBIT(S)

S&C

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #001); Filed By: Visco, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Visco, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Good faith email; Filed By: Visco, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Defendants Discovery Demands; Filed By: Visco, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Visco, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) S&C Filed By: Visco, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Visco, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Visco, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Sweet, K.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Filed By: Sweet, K.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Sweet, K.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Filed By: Visco, J.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Visco, J.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Knauth, B.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Knauth, B.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Knauth, B.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Knauth, B.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Knauth, B.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Knauth, B.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Knauth, B.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less