This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 09/30/2020 at 04:29:46 (UTC).

MARTA R BISONO et al v. VICTOR N PERALTA et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 MARTA R BISONO filed an Other lawsuit against VICTOR N PERALTA. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Kurtz, Jcp. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2015

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Kurtz, Jcp

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marta R Bisono

Adalia Rodriguez Infant By her Mother Natural Guardian WANDA MERCEDES BISONO

Defendants

Wilmer H Vargas

Daniel Rolando lagos

Victor N Peralta

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - OTHER AND CONSENT TO E-FILING

STIPULATION - OTHER AND CONSENT TO E-FILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

RJI -RE: OTHER

RJI -RE: OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/11/2016; Received: 09/25/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2015; Received: 09/25/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER AND CONSENT TO E-FILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/11/2016; Received: 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2015; Received: 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less